U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00262-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deese
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 11, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.