U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hammond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.