U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 04, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 31, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 25, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.