U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Highsmith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.