U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 20, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 20, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.