U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Augustine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 25, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 21, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.