U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rouse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.