U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00241-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores-Aguilar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 19, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Text Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 18, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.