U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cotten
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • April 09, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.