U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00392-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.