U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyce
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.