U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00273-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fields et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [USMS Return of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.