U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz-Jimenez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 01, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 24, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • March 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • March 17, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.