U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCCOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 01, 2025: [SEALED Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • April 30, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • April 30, 2025: [USPO Memorandum]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [SEALED Order for Summons]
  • March 18, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • March 18, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.