U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Knupp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 10, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.