U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00312-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HARPER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 04, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Appoint Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.