U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hendon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Inquiry of Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Inquiry of Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 18, 2025: [Suppress]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.