U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gatlin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 19, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.