U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cortazar-Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver-Other]
  • March 19, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.