U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Neal, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 01, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 31, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Text Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 19, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.