U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Florence
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Discovery ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 21, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Text Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 19, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.