U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 02, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arrest]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 19, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.