U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00260-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cullon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • March 25, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.