U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez Morales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 25, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 20, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.