U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barradas-Leon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time re: Other]
  • April 08, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 04, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 26, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.