U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cantrell, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 24, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 19, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 19, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.