U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00261-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cannady
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 12, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Request]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 19, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.