U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ELDER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 08, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 03, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 02, 2025: [Waiver-Other]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.