U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ELLIOTT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice-Other]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Waiver-Other]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.