U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Philbeck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 25, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 25, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.