U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McAlpin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.