U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dula
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 28, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.