U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 21, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 16, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 21, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.