U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 20, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.