U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patterson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 18, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 27, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 27, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 24, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.