U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00275-2
  • Case Name: USA v. ANGLE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 11, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 09, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 25, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 24, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 19, 2025: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.