U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salyards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 02, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 01, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 27, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.