U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hilton et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.