U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00011-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Cofield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 30, 2025: [Release Status Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 20, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.