U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.