U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00301-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ESPINOSA CORTES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 11, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 03, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.