U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00310-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 14, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 24, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.