U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Suppress ]
  • March 23, 2025: [Dismiss ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.