U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00233-2
  • Case Name: USA v. HAMILTON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 11, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 11, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 07, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 24, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.