U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOBLEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • May 02, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • May 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arrest]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 29, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 29, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 14, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 14, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 28, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Add Counts]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 25, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.