U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FOX et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 23, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appearance Bond]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 01, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 25, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.