U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RIDDLE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 09, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 08, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 25, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.