U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Randolph
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • April 07, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • March 26, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.