U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hedden et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Jury Verdict]
  • April 08, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Dismissal of Counts on Defendant Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • April 08, 2025: [Acquittal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 07, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Returning Trial Exhibits]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.