U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Green
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 17, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 14, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 07, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Indictment ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.